+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act No. 62
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/12/13
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 75
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-4
- Read second time
- Amended
- Requests for debate removed-Rep. Hiott, Tallon, JR Smith, Hixon, Wells, Norman, Hardee, Spires, Hardwick, VS Moss, Loftis, Patrick, Cole, Hosey, Kennedy, Anderson, Quinn, GR Smith, Powers-Norrell, Bannister, Clyburn, Cobb-Hunter, Sellers, DC Moss, Pope, Bedingfield, Sabb, RL Brown
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Tallon, Quinn, JR Smith, Bannister, Hixon, Wells, Pope, Bedingfield, GR Smith, Loftis, Hardwick, Kennedy, Spires, Hardee, DC Moss, Cole, Hiott, Norman, Hosey, Clyburn, Anderson, RL Brown, VS Moss, King, Powers-Norrell, Cobb-Hunter, Hart, Sellers, KR Crawford, Sabb, Patrick
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-27 Nays-16
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto , Corbin, Young
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to Committee on Judiciary
- Recalled from Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced and read first time
On December 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
June 6, 2013: To concur
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
June 5, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 2
April 30, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor