+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 1, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor