+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 26, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor