+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen , Hembree, McElveen
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committed to Committee on Judiciary
- Recalled from Committee on Education
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 11, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3