+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On December 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 14, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 8