+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 259
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/03/16
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 222
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 24, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 3
April 27, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2