+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act No. 13
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 04/23/13
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 19
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-108 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-4
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-6
- Read second time
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
April 11, 2013: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
April 10, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor