+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-0
- Read third time and sent to House
- Amended
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto , Bennett, Hembree, Johnson, Thurmond
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
February 18, 2016: 3rd Reading Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 4
January 28, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor