+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.J.McLeod
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
- Member request name added as sponsor: Mitchell, King
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Felder
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ballentine
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 26, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor