+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Requests for debate-Rep. Norman, Owens, Hiott, Whitmire, Sandifer, WJ McLeod, King, Daning, George, Jefferson, McEachern, RL Brown, Hosey, Govan, Taylor, Spires
- Member request name added as sponsor: M.S.McLeod, Whipper, R.L.Brown
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 10, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 8