+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Berkeley Delegation
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Berkeley Delegation
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
February 15, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 4