+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.Newton
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 3, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 2