+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 4-30-14
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Clemmons, Hiott, Owens, Goldfinch, Bannister, HA Crawford, Hardwick, Sottile, Limehouse, Gilliard, Barfield, Wells, Anderson, RL Brown, GR Smith, Wood, McCoy, Rivers, Crosby
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 30, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor