+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 158
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 04/17/18
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 169
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2018: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 5
March 20, 2018: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor