+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-21-18
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 21, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor