+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 31
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 54
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-2
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 31
- Absent: 4
April 16, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor