+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 253
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 300
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin , Hutto, Bennett
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-38
- Read second time
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2014: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 6
May 28, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
April 30, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor