+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-99 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: W.J.McLeod
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committed to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 16, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 7