+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 227
- Effective date 06/03/16
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 259
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical Affairs
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
March 9, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor