+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-1
- Read second time
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Majority favorable with amend., minority unfavorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 1
April 30, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor