+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 60
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/04/15
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 92
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-3
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-88 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-27-15
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2015: To concur
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
May 27, 2015: Adoption of Bill
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 30
- Absent: 4
April 1, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor