+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 56
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/03/15
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 87
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-86 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Johnson
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 26, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 28, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 31
- Absent: 7