+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
April 30, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 19
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor