+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act No. 32
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/01/13
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 43
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Education
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
April 18, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor