+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to Committee on Banking and Insurance
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-87 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 4-18-13
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Erickson
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
April 18, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 35
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor