+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 89
On July 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 07/07/15
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Veto overridden Ayes-28 Nays-10
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Veto overridden by originating body Yeas-54 Nays-23
On June 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 119
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Amended
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
- Read second time
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-78 Nays-1
- Read second time
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Tues., 3-24-15
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Thur., 3-19-15
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Ways and Means
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
July 7, 2015: To override the veto
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
June 16, 2015: Override the VETO by the Governor
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 34
- Absent: 12
June 4, 2015: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 54
- Absent: 9
March 24, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 41
- Absent: 3