+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reconsider vote whereby read second time
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled from Committee on Education
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced and read first time
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-3
- Read second time
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name removed as sponsor: Hill
- Member request name added as sponsor: Daning, Ryhal
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name removed as sponsor: Dillard, Robinson-Simpson
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Ott, Bales, Rivers, Howard
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Robinson-Simpson, Cobb-Hunter, Brown, Bowers, Hosey, Crosby, Spires, McKnight
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Blackwell, Dillard, Kirby, Johnson, Hixon, Williams, Jefferson, Knight, Hill, White, Bamberg, McEachern, McCravy, Thayer, Elliott, Cole, Magnuson, Forrest
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Atkinson, Anthony, Weeks, Collins, J.E.Smith, Hayes
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Atwater, Huggins, Long, Toole, D.C.Moss, Arrington, Bennett, Davis, West, Hewitt, Bradley, V.S.Moss
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 9, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (115)
Type:
Primary Sponsor