+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act No. 19
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 04/23/13
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 27
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Read second time
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
April 17, 2013: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 18
- Absent: 5
April 9, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3
March 6, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor