+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act No. 185
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/02/14
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 208
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Gregory , Sheheen, S.Martin
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2014: To concur
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
May 20, 2014: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
April 8, 2014: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor