+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 88
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 126
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered enrolled for ratification
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Free conference powers granted
- Free conference committee appointed Hayes, Huto, Bennett
- Free conference report adopted
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Free conference powers granted
- Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0
- Free conference committee appointed Sandifer, Forrester, Stavrinakis
- Free conference report received and adopted
- Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-2
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Sandifer, Forrester, Stavrinakis
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Hayes, Hutto, Bennett
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Non-concurrence in Senate amendment
- Roll call Yeas-23 Nays-81
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Amended
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-13
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Sandifer, Long, Cobb-Hunter, Tallon, Yow, White, Mitchell, Forrester, Hiott, Sottile, Toole, Mack, VS Moss, Clary, Corley, Gilliard, Ballentine, Bedingfield, RL Brown, Clemmons, Hardwick, King, McKnight, Jefferson, McEachern, Clyburn, Hosey, Robinson-Simpson
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Rutherford
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
+ − Votes (6)
June 18, 2015: To adopt the free conference report
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
June 17, 2015: Granting Free Conference Powers
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 13
June 17, 2015: Adopt Free Conference Report
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 13
June 4, 2015: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 81
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 7
June 3, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
March 25, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 7