+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 220
- Effective date See Act for Effective Date
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 251
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Recalled from Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 5
April 26, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor