+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act No. 64
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date 09/11/13
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 77
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to House with amendments
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- House amendment amended
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Amended
- Read second time
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-7
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and read first time
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2013: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 18
June 4, 2013: To adopt Amendment number RFH-1A
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2013: To adopt Amendment number RFH-2
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 28, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 3
April 9, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3