+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Toole
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Vote
March 26, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor