+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Veto sustained Yeas-39 Nays-67
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned on veto consideration until Wed., 1-23-14
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Debate adjourned on veto consideration until Wed., 1-22-14
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Debate adjourned on veto consideration
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 94
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-81 Nays-0
- Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto , Corbin, Young
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-116 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
- Member request name added as sponsor: King
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (4)
January 23, 2014: Override VETO
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 11
- Absent: 7
June 6, 2013: Concur in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 81
- Present/NV: 25
- Absent: 18
June 5, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor