+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act No. 63
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/19/17
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 96
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and enrolled
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Turner , Malloy, Kimpson, Climer, Goldfinch
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Norrell
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Pitts
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Daning
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 10