+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act No. 114
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 02/03/20
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 116
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with amendments
- Senate amendment amended
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Debate adjourned on amendments
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and returned to House with amendments
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Transportation
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Introduced and read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-107 Nays-1
- Read second time
- Amended
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Daning, Hixon
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Felder
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (4)
January 21, 2020: To concur
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
January 15, 2020: Adopt Amendment 1A Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 3
May 8, 2019: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 9, 2019: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor