+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General
- Introduced and read first time
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Member request name added as sponsor: Erickson, Knight
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: King, Henegan
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
March 23, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor