+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
- Introduced and read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time and sent to Senate
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Owens, Barfield
- Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-40
- Read second time
- Amended
- Requests for debate-Rep. Weeks, Clemmons, Allison, Toole, Atwater, Henderson, GR Smith, Brannon, Loftis, Hixon, Hardwick, Sottile, Nanney, VS Moss, Dillard, Whipper, RL Brown, Forrester, Skelton, Neal, King, Newton, Patrick, Long, Erickson, McCoy, Williams, Jefferson, Owens, Govan, K Crawford, Crosby, Danning, Herbkersman, Whitmire, Bowen, Gagnon, Gambrell, George, Hayes, Thayer, Hosey, Kennedy, Pope, JR Smith, Goldfinch, Anderson, Wood, Ryhal
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Bedingfield, Putnam, Murphy, Rivers, Tallon, Gagnon
- Requests for debate-Rep. Sandifer
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: Taylor
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Member request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss, Chumley, Loftis
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On December 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (10)
January 24, 2013: Table the motion to recommit
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 9
January 24, 2013: Table Motion to Adjourn Debate
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 46
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 9
January 24, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 10
January 23, 2013: Table Amendment number 4
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 15
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2013: Table Amendment number 5
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2013: Table Amendment number 1
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 70
- Present/NV: 13
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2013: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 40
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2013: Table Amendment number 6
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2013: Table Amendment number 2
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2013: Table Amendment number 3
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor