+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-33 Nays-10
- Read second time
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amended
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
April 24, 2013: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 24, 2013: Motion to table mot. to reconsider
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor