+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act No. 4
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 4/5/17
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 10
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-93 Nays-0
- Read second time
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Introduced and read first time
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Finance
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Introduced and read first time
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2017: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 21
- Absent: 6
January 26, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1