+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
- Introduced and read first time
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Transportation
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced and read first time
On December 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
March 4, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4