+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act No. 135
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 03/12/18
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 139
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-104 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Amended
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Introduced and read first time
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
February 13, 2018: To concur
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2018: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 2
March 15, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor