+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Corrections and Penology
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
- Introduced and read first time
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
- Prefiled
+ − Vote
February 8, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 4