+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act No. 22
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 06/01/15
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 43
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-45 Nays-0
- Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-59 Nays-22
- Read second time
- Amended
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-20-15
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-44 Nays-0
- Read second time
- Committee Amendment Adopted
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee: Thurmond , Allen, Corbin
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On December 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2015: To concur
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 1
May 20, 2015: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 37
- Absent: 5
April 15, 2015: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor