+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act No. 164
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 04/29/16
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed By Governor
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified R 170
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time and enrolled
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
- Roll call Yeas-101 Nays-0
- Read second time
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Recalled from Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and sent to House
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
- Read second time
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2016: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 17
- Absent: 6
February 18, 2016: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 3