+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act No. 1
- Effective date 02/18/21
- Signed By Governor
- Ratified R 2
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-74 Nays-39
- Read third time and enrolled
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Roll call Yeas-79 Nays-35
- Read second time
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Requests for debate-Rep. Hiott, Simrill, Hixon, Carter, Whitmire, Caskey, Huggins, Davis, Bannister, GR Smith, VS Moss, Stringer, King, Nutt, Allison, Oremus, B Newton, T Moore, Pope, Elliott, Clyburn, Hosey, JL Johnson, Bailey, Fry, Hewitt, Jordon, Yow, Gilliam, Sandifer, McGinnis, Hardee, Gatch, R Williams, Brawley, Jefferson, McCravy, MM Smith, Brittain, Weeks, Danning, Cobb-Hunter, Thayer, Kimmons, Gagnon,
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced and read first time
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
- Read third time and sent to House
- Roll call Ayes-30 Nays-13
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Roll call Ayes-29 Nays-17
- Read second time
- Amended
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Debate interrupted
- Amended
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable with amendment Medical Affairs
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Introduced and read first time
On December 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 6
February 17, 2021: Rescind Rule 3.9
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 76
- Present/NV: 25
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2021: Passage of Bill
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 3
January 28, 2021: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2021: To adopt Amendment number 12
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2021: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 17
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor