+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scrivener's error corrected
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations
- Polled out of committee Invitations
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor