+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted, sent to House
- Amended
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations
- Polled out of committee Invitations
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations
- Introduced
On December 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations
- Prefiled