+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
- Recalled from Committee on Transportation
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Introduced
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor