+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Adopted, sent to Senate
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Introduced
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor